AL HB208 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 1:41 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ozark, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, city authorized to regulate for on-premises and off-premises sales, referendum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ozark, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, city authorized to regulate for on-premises and off-premises sales, referendum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:41 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
2018-03-08HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-238.
2018-03-08HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-08SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08HousePassed Second House
2018-03-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 692
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2018-01-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 57
2018-01-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback