AL HB204 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2016 at 8:41 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2016 at 8:41 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, ballots, reorder offices and candidates names, Sec. 17-6-25 am'd.
Title
Elections, ballots, reorder offices and candidates names, Sec. 17-6-25 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2016 at 8:41 p.m. on May 3, 2016. |
2016-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-300. |
2016-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 903 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 208 |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |