AL HB204 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 6:12 p.m. on May 26, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 6:12 p.m. on May 26, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voter list, Secretary of State, one copy provided to Legislators at no charge, Sec. 17-4-38 am'd.
Title
Voter list, Secretary of State, one copy provided to Legislators at no charge, Sec. 17-4-38 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Wingo [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:12 p.m. on May 26, 2015. |
2015-05-26 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-26 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-290. |
2015-05-26 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1162 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Beasley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 417 |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 416 |
2015-04-16 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |