AL HB203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 7:40 p.m. on May 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 7:40 p.m. on May 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., Barnwell Landmark District, annexation of property in district prohibited by local law, exception, const. amend.
Title
Baldwin Co., Barnwell Landmark District, annexation of property in district prohibited by local law, exception, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Faust [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - House - Faust motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 7:40 p.m. on May 7, 2020. |
2020-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-98. |
2020-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2020-05-07 | House | Faust motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 539 |
2020-05-07 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 549 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 548 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 547 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Chambliss Amendment Offered |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 159 |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 158 |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |