AL HB203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Chilton Co., dangerous dogs, procedures for declaring dog dangerous in unincorporated areas of county, registration requirement, criminal penalties, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chilton Co., dangerous dogs, procedures for declaring dog dangerous in unincorporated areas of county, registration requirement, criminal penalties, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Ward motion to adopt Local Application Resolution (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Martin motion to Local Application (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-184.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 1:42 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
2018-03-08HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-08SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08HousePassed Second House
2018-03-08SenateWard motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 676
2018-03-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 675
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2018-01-25HouseMartin motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 93
2018-01-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 92
2018-01-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback