AL HB203 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Conference Committee on HB203 2017RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Conference Committee on HB203 2017RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schedule I controlled substances, Fentanyl and Fentanyl analogues included, criminal penalties for trafficking, Secs. 13A-12-211, 13A-12-231, 20-2-23 am'd.
Title
Schedule I controlled substances, Fentanyl and Fentanyl analogues included, criminal penalties for trafficking, Secs. 13A-12-211, 13A-12-231, 20-2-23 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Weaver motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Reed motion to Accede (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Weaver motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Weaver motion to Table (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Reed motion to Accede (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Weaver motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Weaver motion to Table (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Conference Committee on HB203 2017RS first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-19 | House | Weaver motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1036 |
2017-05-19 | House | Conference Report |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reed motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1285 P&PO appoints Ward, Smitherman and Scofield |
2017-05-19 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2017-05-19 | House | Weaver motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1016 House appoints Weaver, Hill and Scott |
2017-05-19 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1201 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1200 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Brewbaker Amendment Offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1199 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1198 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Health and Human Services Amendment Offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-11 | House | Members intended to cosponsor |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 486 |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 485 |
2017-04-11 | House | Weaver Substitute Offered |
2017-04-11 | House | Weaver motion to Table adopted Roll Call 484 |
2017-04-11 | House | Health first Substitute Offered |
2017-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |