AL HB202 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Delivered to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Delivered to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Business and Nonprofit Entities Code, substantially revised to allow corporations to elect to become benefit corporations, update definitions, allow for electronic filing, and provide standards for filing instruments, numerous sections of Title 10A added, amended, and renumbered
Title
Business and Nonprofit Entities Code, substantially revised to allow corporations to elect to become benefit corporations, update definitions, allow for electronic filing, and provide standards for filing instruments, numerous sections of Title 10A added, amended, and renumbered
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 12, 2020. |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-73. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-03-12 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 379 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 106 |
2020-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Fiscal Responsibility |