AL HB202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Oak Grove, corp. limits alt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oak Grove, corp. limits alt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
2019-05-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-16SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-15HouseEnrolled
2019-05-15HousePassed Second House
2019-05-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 737
2019-05-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2019-03-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 12
2019-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback