AL HB201 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
RSA, procedure established for funding benefit increases of ERS and TRS retirees
Title
RSA, procedure established for funding benefit increases of ERS and TRS retirees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Lee substitution B8XY4J4-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Lee substitution B8XY4J4-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-03-21 | House | Engrossed |
2024-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 302 |
2024-03-21 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 301 B8XY4J4-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ways and Means General Fund 1st Substitute Offered B8XY4J4-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted B8XY4J4-1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |