AL HB20 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Hospitals and health care facilities, licensing by St. Bd. of Health, advisory board to the State Health Officer, authorized to meet by electronic means and establish rules of procedures for meetings, Sec. 22-21-27 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals and health care facilities, licensing by St. Bd. of Health, advisory board to the State Health Officer, authorized to meet by electronic means and establish rules of procedures for meetings, Sec. 22-21-27 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseForwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
2019-05-23HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-315.
2019-05-23HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-23HouseEnrolled
2019-05-23SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-23HousePassed Second House
2019-05-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1111
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
2019-04-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 93
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback