AL HB20 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Banks and banking, Section 247, (Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd. to prohibit establishment of a bank except by general banking law, to provide for unlimited duration, to prohibit political subdivisions from owning stock or lending credit, and to provide for examination requirements; Sections 248, 249, 251, 252, 253, 254 (Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), repealed, const. amend.
Title
Banks and banking, Section 247, (Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd. to prohibit establishment of a bank except by general banking law, to provide for unlimited duration, to prohibit political subdivisions from owning stock or lending credit, and to provide for examination requirements; Sections 248, 249, 251, 252, 253, 254 (Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), repealed, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Banking and Insurance | |
2011-04-28 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 320 | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |