AL HB2 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Forwarded to Governor on November 3, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. on November 3, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Forwarded to Governor on November 3, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. on November 3, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House, districts redrawn, Sec. 29-1-2.3 repealed; Sec. 29-1-2.3 added
Title
House, districts redrawn, Sec. 29-1-2.3 repealed; Sec. 29-1-2.3 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 35 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 10 (Y: 68 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 9 (Y: 69 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 8 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Pringle motion to Table Roll Call 7 (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Pringle motion to Table Roll Call 6 (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Pringle motion to Table Roll Call 5 (Y: 59 N: 20 NV: 18 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 10 (Y: 68 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 9 (Y: 69 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 8 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Pringle motion to Table Roll Call 7 (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Pringle motion to Table Roll Call 6 (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - Pringle motion to Table Roll Call 5 (Y: 59 N: 20 NV: 18 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on November 3, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. on November 3, 2021. |
2021-11-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-556. |
2021-11-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-11-03 | House | Enrolled |
2021-11-03 | House | Mooney intended to votte "Yea" |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-11-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 35 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Reed motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-11-01 | House | Hall Dissent filed |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-11-01 | House | Engrossed |
2021-11-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 10 |
2021-11-01 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 9 |
2021-11-01 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 8 |
2021-11-01 | House | Pringle motion to Table adopted Roll Call 7 |
2021-11-01 | House | Gray Substitute to Substitute Offered |
2021-11-01 | House | Pringle motion to Table adopted Roll Call 6 |
2021-11-01 | House | Grimsley Substitute to Substitute Offered |
2021-11-01 | House | Pringle motion to Table adopted Roll Call 5 |
2021-11-01 | House | Meadows Substitute to Substitute Offered |
2021-11-01 | House | Pringle first Substitute Offered |
2021-11-01 | House | Sells motion to recess adopted Voice Vote |
2021-11-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-10-29 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-10-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |