AL HB2 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 4:20 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 4:20 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama A & M University, board of trustees, nominating committee established, development of training program, at-large appointment may be from outside of Alabama, powers expanded, Secs. 16-49-20, 16-49-21, 16-49-23 am'd.; Sec. 16-49-25 repealed (2011-20426)
Title
Alabama A & M University, board of trustees, nominating committee established, development of training program, at-large appointment may be from outside of Alabama, powers expanded, Secs. 16-49-20, 16-49-21, 16-49-23 am'd.; Sec. 16-49-25 repealed (2011-20426)
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Hall motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 4:20 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-657 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Hall motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1095 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 949 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 948 | |
2011-06-02 | Sanford Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 696 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 695 | |
2011-05-05 | Hall Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 694 | |
2011-05-05 | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 693 | |
2011-05-05 | Boards, Agencies and Commissions first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |