AL HB199 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, traffic accident reports, confidentiality, exceptions, Sec. 32-10-7 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, traffic accident reports, confidentiality, exceptions, Sec. 32-10-7 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Fridy motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseForwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
2018-03-28SenateJudiciary second Amendment Offered
2018-03-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-570.
2018-03-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-28HouseEnrolled
2018-03-28SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-28SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28HouseFridy motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1079
2018-03-28HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1039
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 965
2018-03-21SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-21SenateWard Amendment Offered
2018-03-21SenateWard motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-21SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-21SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 964
2018-03-21SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2018-02-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-02-22HouseEngrossed
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 465
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 464
2018-02-22HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB199&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB199-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB199-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB199-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190303-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192674-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192822-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193180-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590383&VOTE=464&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590384&VOTE=465&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599062&VOTE=964&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599089&VOTE=965&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599994&VOTE=1039&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602171&VOTE=1079&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback