AL HB198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Building codes; Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board; Alabama Residential Building Code, authorized to be established
Title
Building codes; Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board; Alabama Residential Building Code, authorized to be established
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 1138 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 1137 TMLF199-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 370 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 369 QUAA111-1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt - Roll Call 1137 TMLF199-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 370 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 369 QUAA111-1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-20 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-09 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1138 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1137 TMLF199-1 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Givhan 1st Substitute Offered TMLF199-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-02 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 370 |
2024-04-02 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 369 QUAA111-1 |
2024-04-02 | House | Shirey 1st Amendment Offered QUAA111-1 |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | House | Pending House County and Municipal Government |
2024-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB288 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed