AL HB198 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on March 8, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Assistance and Service Animal Integrity in Housing Act, documentation to be provided to landlord for exeception, offenses of misrepresentation of entitlement to an assistance animal or service animal and misrepresentation of an animal as an assistance animal or service animal created as misdemeanors, Alabama Assistance and Service Animal Integrity in Housing Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Assistance and Service Animal Integrity in Housing Act, documentation to be provided to landlord for exeception, offenses of misrepresentation of entitlement to an assistance animal or service animal and misrepresentation of an animal as an assistance animal or service animal created as misdemeanors, Alabama Assistance and Service Animal Integrity in Housing Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - Fridy motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 49) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on March 8, 2018.
2018-03-08HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-235.
2018-03-08HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-08SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-08SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseFridy motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 628
2018-03-06HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 649
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-06SenateWhatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 638
2018-03-06SenateWhatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateWhatley Amendment Offered
2018-03-06SenateWhatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 637
2018-03-06SenateWhatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 636
2018-03-06SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-06SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2018-01-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseCosponsors Added
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 124
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB198&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB198-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191963-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192096-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584000&VOTE=124&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584003&VOTE=125&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592971&VOTE=636&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592973&VOTE=637&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593016&VOTE=638&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593148&VOTE=649&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593296&VOTE=628&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback