AL HB196 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:48 p. m. on April 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:48 p. m. on April 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Telephone service, basic telephone service, defined to be consistent with federal regulation and include cell phone service, etc., obligation to provide service removed, exception for certain time, Secs. 37-2A-2, 37-2A-8 am'd
Title
Telephone service, basic telephone service, defined to be consistent with federal regulation and include cell phone service, etc., obligation to provide service removed, exception for certain time, Secs. 37-2A-2, 37-2A-8 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Forwarded to Governor at 2:48 p. m. on April 3, 2012. | |
2012-04-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-181. | |
2012-04-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-04-03 | Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 547 | |
2012-04-03 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 393 | |
2012-03-22 | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 392 | |
2012-03-22 | Singleton Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Ward to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-06 | Lee intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-03-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 234 | |
2012-03-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 233 | |
2012-03-06 | Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |