AL HB194 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:24 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:24 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, prohibits state and local election officials and their employees from soliciting, accepting, using, or disposing of certain donations from individuals or nongovernmental entities for funding certain election-related expenses
Title
Elections, prohibits state and local election officials and their employees from soliciting, accepting, using, or disposing of certain donations from individuals or nongovernmental entities for funding certain election-related expenses
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1060 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 585 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 584 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 583 (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - HBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 582 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 585 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 584 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 583 (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - HBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 582 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:24 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-321. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1060 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 585 |
2022-03-10 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 584 |
2022-03-10 | House | Ledbetter motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 583 |
2022-03-10 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question offered |
2022-03-10 | House | Allen Amendment Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |