AL HB194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Palliative and end of life individual health plans, minors, representative authorized to provide health care and other directives to health care providers, schools, etc. where terminally ill, Alex Hoover Act, Secs. 22-8A-15 to 22-8A-17, inclusive, added; Secs. 22-8A-2, 22-8A-3, 22-8A-7 am'd.
Title
Palliative and end of life individual health plans, minors, representative authorized to provide health care and other directives to health care providers, schools, etc. where terminally ill, Alex Hoover Act, Secs. 22-8A-15 to 22-8A-17, inclusive, added; Secs. 22-8A-2, 22-8A-3, 22-8A-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Weaver motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Weaver motion to Table (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Weaver motion to Table (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-466. |
2018-03-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-22 | House | Weaver motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1005 |
2018-03-22 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 959 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 958 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Health and Human Services first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Acted on by Health and Human Services as Favorable with 1 substitute |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-02-27 | House | Engrossed |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 487 |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 486 |
2018-02-27 | House | Weaver first Substitute Offered |
2018-02-27 | House | Weaver motion to Table adopted Roll Call 485 |
2018-02-27 | House | Health Amendment Offered |
2018-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |