AL HB193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil actions, obesity or weight gain, suits prohibited, limited exceptions, Commonsense Consumption Act
Title
Civil actions, obesity or weight gain, suits prohibited, limited exceptions, Commonsense Consumption Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Beckman [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Rep. John Merrill [R] | Rep. Barry Moore [R] | Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 72) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Jones motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Jones motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Further Consideration | |
2011-06-02 | Bussman request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities | |
2011-05-03 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Cosponsors Added | |
2011-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 591 | |
2011-05-03 | Jones motion to Table adopted Roll Call 590 | |
2011-05-03 | Hall Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-03 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 589 | |
2011-05-03 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |