AL HB191 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to crimes and offenses; to add Article 12, commencing with Section 13A-6-260, to Chapter 6 of Title 13A to the Code of Alabama 1975, to identify gang members, to enhance penalties for any criminal activity that benefits, promotes, or furthers the interest of a gang, and to establish mandatory consecutive penalties for any firearm possession in certain circumstances; to amend Section 12-15-204, Code of Alabama 1975, to require any juvenile 16 years of age or older to be tried as an adult for any gang related criminal activity; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to crimes and offenses; to add Article 12, commencing with Section 13A-6-260, to Chapter 6 of Title 13A to the Code of Alabama 1975, to identify gang members, to enhance penalties for any criminal activity that benefits, promotes, or furthers the interest of a gang, and to establish mandatory consecutive penalties for any firearm possession in certain circumstances; to amend Section 12-15-204, Code of Alabama 1975, to require any juvenile 16 years of age or older to be tried as an adult for any gang related criminal activity; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | House | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary |
2023-04-12 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary WGXC55-1 |
2023-04-07 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary ODZRWW-1 |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Judiciary |
2023-03-23 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |