AL HB191 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 5:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 5:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Natural Death Act, certification of surrogate to make end of life health care decisions, notarization requirement removed, Sec. 22-8A-11 am'd.
Title
Natural Death Act, certification of surrogate to make end of life health care decisions, notarization requirement removed, Sec. 22-8A-11 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Oliver motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 967 (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 661 (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 660 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 75 (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 74 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Oliver motion to Adopt Roll Call 73 (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 661 (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 660 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 75 (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 74 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Oliver motion to Adopt Roll Call 73 (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 5:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-434. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-07 | House | Oliver motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 967 |
2022-04-07 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 958 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 661 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Healthcare Amendment Offered |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 75 |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 74 |
2022-02-08 | House | Oliver Amendment Offered |
2022-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |