AL HB191 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 5:50 p.m. on May 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 5:50 p.m. on May 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real property, annexation, property with overlapped police jurisdictions, all property to be annexed with consent of all parties and affected municipalities under certain conditions, Sec. 11-42-21 am'd.
Title
Real property, annexation, property with overlapped police jurisdictions, all property to be annexed with consent of all parties and affected municipalities under certain conditions, Sec. 11-42-21 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1372 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 1371 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 92 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 91 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 1371 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 92 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 91 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 5:50 p.m. on May 6, 2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-459. |
2021-05-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1372 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 92 |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |