AL HB191 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improvement districts, additional powers, notice of hearing not required if held during regular meeting, assessment fees on lands included, nonpayment of fees, remedies, bonds, Alabama Improvement District Act amended, Sec. 11-99A-52 added; Secs. 11-99A-2, 11-99A-3, 11-99A-4, 11-99A-6, 11-99A-8, 11-99A-9, 11-99A-11, 11-99A-12, 11-99A-13, 11-99A-15, 11-99A-19, 11-99A-21, 11-99A-36, 11-99A-42, 11-99A-43 am'd.; Secs. 11-99A-17, 11-99A-30 repealed
Title
Improvement districts, additional powers, notice of hearing not required if held during regular meeting, assessment fees on lands included, nonpayment of fees, remedies, bonds, Alabama Improvement District Act amended, Sec. 11-99A-52 added; Secs. 11-99A-2, 11-99A-3, 11-99A-4, 11-99A-6, 11-99A-8, 11-99A-9, 11-99A-11, 11-99A-12, 11-99A-13, 11-99A-15, 11-99A-19, 11-99A-21, 11-99A-36, 11-99A-42, 11-99A-43 am'd.; Secs. 11-99A-17, 11-99A-30 repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-05-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-05-03 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1208 | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1207 | |
2012-05-03 | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1206 | |
2012-05-03 | County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |