AL HB19 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lobbying, state agencies may not contract for lobbying service

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lobbying, state agencies may not contract for lobbying service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-09-14HouseEngrossed
2015-09-14HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 43
2015-09-14HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 42
2015-09-14HouseGarrett Amendment Offered
2015-09-14HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-14HouseGarrett motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-14HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-09-11HouseGaston motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-11HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-09-10HouseGarrett motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-10HouseGarrett Amendment Offered
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 20
2015-09-10HouseEthics and Campaign Finance first Substitute Offered
2015-09-10HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-09-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback