AL HB19 | 2012 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Delivered to Governor at 4:22 a. m. on May 24, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

House of Representatives, redistricting pursuant to 2010 federal census, venue for legal action challenging to be in Montgomery County Circuit Court, official maps of districts retained in Secretary of State Office and printed with Acts, use for legislative intent, Sec. 29-1-1.2 repealed; Sec. 29-1-1.2 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House of Representatives, redistricting pursuant to 2010 federal census, venue for legal action challenging to be in Montgomery County Circuit Court, official maps of districts retained in Secretary of State Office and printed with Acts, use for legislative intent, Sec. 29-1-1.2 repealed; Sec. 29-1-1.2 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Singleton first Substitutet (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Smitherman first Substitute (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Sanders first Substitute (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Adopt CC&E substitute (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-24 Delivered to Governor at 4:22 a. m. on May 24, 2012.
2012-05-24 Assigned Act No. 2012-602.
2012-05-24 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-24 Signature Requested
2012-05-24 Enrolled
2012-05-24 Passed Second House
2012-05-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 38
2012-05-24 Singleton first Substitutet lost Roll Call 37.
2012-05-24 Singleton first Substitute Offered.
2012-05-24 Smitherman first Substitute lost Roll Call 36.
2012-05-24 Smitherman first Substitute Offered.
2012-05-24 Sanders first Substitute lost Roll Call 35.
2012-05-24 Sanders first Substitute Offered.
2012-05-24 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-22 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2012-05-21 Engrossed
2012-05-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 12
2012-05-21 Motion to Adopt CC&E substitute adopted Roll Call 11
2012-05-21 Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 10
2012-05-21 McClendon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 9
2012-05-21 Knight first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 McClendon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 8
2012-05-21 McClammy first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 McClendon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 7
2012-05-21 Ford first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 McClendon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 6
2012-05-21 Hubbard (J) first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 Oden intended to vote "Yea"
2012-05-21 McClendon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 5
2012-05-21 Buskey first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 Motion to Adopt offered
2012-05-21 Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Substitute Offered
2012-05-21 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-18 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2012-05-17 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB19
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB19-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB19-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452195&VOTE=5&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452211&VOTE=6&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452213&VOTE=7&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452215&VOTE=8&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452217&VOTE=9&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452219&VOTE=10&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452220&VOTE=11&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452221&VOTE=12&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452773&VOTE=35&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452776&VOTE=36&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452778&VOTE=37&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452779&VOTE=38&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback