AL HB19 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, private high school driver education instructor certified by the Department of Public Safety, authorized to be third party testing agents for driver education students, Sec. 32-6-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, private high school driver education instructor certified by the Department of Public Safety, authorized to be third party testing agents for driver education students, Sec. 32-6-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-501.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1538
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-04-03 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
2012-03-22 Engrossed
2012-03-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 537
2012-03-22 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 536
2012-03-22 Barton Amendment Offered
2012-03-22 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback