AL HB19 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor on June 9, 2011 at 4:40 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor on June 9, 2011 at 4:40 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, photo identification required to register to vote, Secretary of State required to issue identification cards to persons without photo identification at no cost, Sec. 17-9-30 am'd.; Act 2010-687, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2011-20004)
Title
Elections, photo identification required to register to vote, Secretary of State required to issue identification cards to persons without photo identification at no cost, Sec. 17-9-30 am'd.; Act 2010-687, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2011-20004)
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt CC&E Amendment (Y: 18 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt CC&E Substitute (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Motion to Previous Question (Y: 57 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt CC&E Amendment (Y: 18 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt CC&E Substitute (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Motion to Previous Question (Y: 57 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Delivered to Governor on June 9, 2011 at 4:40 p.m. | |
2011-06-09 | Assigned Act No. 2011-673. | |
2011-06-09 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-09 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-09 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1063 | |
2011-06-09 | Rules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1062. | |
2011-06-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections | |
2011-03-22 | Engrossed | |
2011-03-22 | Cosponsors Added | |
2011-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 62 | |
2011-03-22 | Hubbard (J) intended to vote "Nay" | |
2011-03-22 | Motion to Adopt CC&E Amendment adopted Roll Call 61 | |
2011-03-22 | CC&E 1st Amendment Offered | |
2011-03-22 | Motion to Adopt CC&E Substitute adopted Roll Call 60 | |
2011-03-22 | Motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 59 | |
2011-03-22 | Holmes motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 58 | |
2011-03-22 | Rich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 57 | |
2011-03-22 | Hubbard (J) first Substitute Offered | |
2011-03-22 | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Substitute Offered | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |