AL HB189 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Governor at 3:26 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2020, from Education Trust Fund to the State Dept. of Education, Alabama Community College System, Marine Environmental Sciences Consortium, Commerce Dept., and the Alabama Institute for the Deaf and Blind, Act 2019-403, 2019 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2020, from Education Trust Fund to the State Dept. of Education, Alabama Community College System, Marine Environmental Sciences Consortium, Commerce Dept., and the Alabama Institute for the Deaf and Blind, Act 2019-403, 2019 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:26 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
2020-05-18HouseClerk of the House Certification
2020-05-18SenateSignature Requested
2020-05-18HouseEnrolled
2020-05-18HouseSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2020-05-18HouseMoore (P) intended to vote "Yea"
2020-05-18SenateOrr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 736
2020-05-18SenateHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2020-05-18HousePoole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 578
2020-05-18HouseExecutive Amendment Offered
2020-05-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
2020-05-09HouseClerk of the House Certification
2020-05-09SenateSignature Requested
2020-05-09HouseEnrolled
2020-05-09SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2020-05-09HousePoole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 575
2020-05-09HouseConcurrence Requested
2020-05-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 718
2020-05-09SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 717
2020-05-09SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2020-05-09SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2020-05-09SenateFinance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
2020-05-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2020-05-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2020-05-07HouseEngrossed
2020-05-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 454
2020-05-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 453
2020-05-07HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2020-05-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-05-05HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2020-02-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB189&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/HB189-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/HB189-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/HB189-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/206950-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/206950-5.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/206950-7.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/207440-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=639658&VOTE=453&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=639659&VOTE=454&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=641132&VOTE=717&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=641133&VOTE=718&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=641186&VOTE=575&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=641520&VOTE=578&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=641581&VOTE=736&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback