AL HB189 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Condominium Act, define terms, required in state escrow agent, withdrawals limited, written notice required, Sec. 35-8A-410 am'd.
Title
Uniform Condominium Act, define terms, required in state escrow agent, withdrawals limited, written notice required, Sec. 35-8A-410 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-350. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 944 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2016-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 329 |
2016-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |