AL HB189 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-18 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:12 p.m. on February 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-18 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:12 p.m. on February 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dale Co., lodging tax, co. commission authorized to levy recreational vehicles and campgrounds excluded
Title
Dale Co., lodging tax, co. commission authorized to levy recreational vehicles and campgrounds excluded
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 3:12 p.m. on February 18, 2014. |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-55. |
2014-02-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 404 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-01-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 17 |
2014-01-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |