AL HB188 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of State, legislative acts and resolutions, disribution in electronic format, state deeds and leases, recording in electronic format, provide notice to all recipients, Secs. 36-14-1, 36-14-11, 36-14-12, 36-14-13, am'd.
Title
Secretary of State, legislative acts and resolutions, disribution in electronic format, state deeds and leases, recording in electronic format, provide notice to all recipients, Secs. 36-14-1, 36-14-11, 36-14-12, 36-14-13, am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Fridy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-414. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1425 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |
2019-05-23 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 984 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |