AL HB188 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
Pending: Senate Constitution, Ethics and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
Pending: Senate Constitution, Ethics and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voter lists, electronic poll books in lieu of printed lists of qualified voters at polling place, Sec. of State authorized to implement pilot program, Sec. 17-4-2.1 added; Sec. 17-4-2 am'd.
Title
Voter lists, electronic poll books in lieu of printed lists of qualified voters at polling place, Sec. of State authorized to implement pilot program, Sec. 17-4-2.1 added; Sec. 17-4-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections |
2016-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 258 |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |