AL HB187 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Delivered to Governor at 10:18 a.m. on February 27, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Delivered to Governor at 10:18 a.m. on February 27, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 2 municipalities (Mobile), program for All Inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE program), assessments for Alabama Health Care Trust Fund, use to fund Medicaid, licensure by Health Department
Title
Class 2 municipalities (Mobile), program for All Inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE program), assessments for Alabama Health Care Trust Fund, use to fund Medicaid, licensure by Health Department
Sponsors
Rep. James Ison [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - Ison motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Glover motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Glover motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:18 a.m. on February 27, 2014. |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-126. |
2014-02-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-02-27 | House | Ison motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 465 |
2014-02-27 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 499 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Glover motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 498 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Local Legislation No. 3 Amendment Offered |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 3 |
2014-02-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 220 |
2014-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |