AL HB187 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Association of Rescue Squads, contributions, income tax refund check-off

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Association of Rescue Squads, contributions, income tax refund check-off

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-543.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1507
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2012-03-15 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-28 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 170
2012-02-28 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-16 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback