AL HB186 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., White House Fork Landmark District, annexation of property in district prohibited by local law, exception, const. amend.
Title
Baldwin Co., White House Fork Landmark District, annexation of property in district prohibited by local law, exception, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Local Application Roll Call 246 (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 245 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Shiver motion to Adopt Roll Call 244 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 245 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Shiver motion to Adopt Roll Call 244 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 246 |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 245 |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
HB132 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation