AL HB186 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elections, authorize student interns to assist, program created

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, authorize student interns to assist, program created

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateFurther Consideration
2019-05-31SenateChesteen motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2019-05-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2019-04-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 289
2019-04-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback