AL HB185 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Municipality or county, business license tax, home health agency and hospice, tax due only where headquarters or branch office is located, tax not to be levied only because of delivery of service by employees, Sec 11-51-90.3 added
Title
Municipality or county, business license tax, home health agency and hospice, tax due only where headquarters or branch office is located, tax not to be levied only because of delivery of service by employees, Sec 11-51-90.3 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-19 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-19 | House | Fridy intended to vote "Yea" |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 882 |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 881 |
2015-05-19 | House | Johnson (R) Amendment Offered |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 880 |
2015-05-19 | House | Health Amendment Offered |
2015-05-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |