AL HB184 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hunting, authorize the taking of whitetail deer or feral swine by means of bait, Secs. 9-11-244, 9-11-245 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting, authorize the taking of whitetail deer or feral swine by means of bait, Secs. 9-11-244, 9-11-245 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 88) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Williams (JW) motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 72 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Williams (JW) motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Williams (JW) motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenatePending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry with 1 amendment
2017-04-13SenateAgriculture, Conservation, and Forestry first Amendment Offered
2017-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-02-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
2017-02-28HouseEngrossed
2017-02-28HouseCosponsors Added
2017-02-28HouseHanes intended to vote "Nay"
2017-02-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 96
2017-02-28HouseWilliams (JW) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 95
2017-02-28HouseJackson Amendment Offered
2017-02-28HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 94
2017-02-28HouseWilliams (JW) first Substitute Offered
2017-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-28HouseWilliams (JW) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 93
2017-02-28HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment #2 Resumed
2017-02-28HouseWilliams (JW) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 92
2017-02-28HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment #1 Resumed
2017-02-23HouseMotion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2017-02-23HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment #2 Offered
2017-02-23HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment #1 Offered
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2017-02-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2017-02-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB184&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB184-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560695&VOTE=92&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560697&VOTE=93&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560700&VOTE=94&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560743&VOTE=96&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560728&VOTE=95&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=560748&VOTE=97&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback