AL HB184 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Assigned Act No. 2015-127.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Monroe Co., tobacco, levy tax on tobacco products, collect, distrib. proceeds, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Monroe Co., tobacco, levy tax on tobacco products, collect, distrib. proceeds, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-07 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-127.
2015-05-07HouseForwarded to Secretary of State on May 7, 2015 at 3:30 p.m.
2015-05-07HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-05-07HouseEnrolled
2015-05-07SenateSignature Requested
2015-05-07HousePassed Second House
2015-05-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 854
2015-05-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-05SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-03-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 120
2015-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-03-17HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback