AL HB183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Justice Information Commission, requirement for Secretary of Ala. State Law Enforcement Agency, deleted, Sec. 41-9-593 am'd.
Title
Alabama Justice Information Commission, requirement for Secretary of Ala. State Law Enforcement Agency, deleted, Sec. 41-9-593 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Sells [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Judiciary |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 308 |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |