AL HB183 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sonogram, specific information regarding unborn child, required notice, penalty for violation, Ultrasound Access Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sonogram, specific information regarding unborn child, required notice, penalty for violation, Ultrasound Access Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Pettus motion to Table (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-28HouseIndefinitely Postponed
2016-04-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback