AL HB180 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriation, supplemental appropriation from Education Trust Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs and State Department of Education for fiscal year ending September 30, 2018, Act 2017-335, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation, supplemental appropriation from Education Trust Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs and State Department of Education for fiscal year ending September 30, 2018, Act 2017-335, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseForwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
2018-03-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-503.
2018-03-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-28HouseEnrolled
2018-03-28SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-28SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28HousePoole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1076
2018-03-28HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 846
2018-03-15SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 845
2018-03-15SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2018-02-13HouseEngrossed
2018-02-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 318
2018-02-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 317
2018-02-13HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2018-02-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB180&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB180-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191009-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=587968&VOTE=317&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=587969&VOTE=318&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596688&VOTE=845&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596689&VOTE=846&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602145&VOTE=1076&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback