AL HB180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Asbestos claims, damages of successor corporations limited to fair market value of total gross assets at time of merger or consolidation
Title
Asbestos claims, damages of successor corporations limited to fair market value of total gross assets at time of merger or consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-545 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 976 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-02 | Holtzclaw request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted. | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 391 | |
2011-04-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |