AL HB18 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prosthetists and Orthotists Board, licensure, exemptions further provided for, Sec. 34-25A-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosthetists and Orthotists Board, licensure, exemptions further provided for, Sec. 34-25A-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27HouseEnrolled
2018-02-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-151.
2018-02-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:16 p.m. on February 27, 2018.
2018-02-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-02-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-02-22HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22HousePassed Second House
2018-02-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 485
2018-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-30SenateReported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2018-01-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 102
2018-01-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback