AL HB18 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 4:24 p.m. on March 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 4:24 p.m. on March 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dale Co., sheriff, service of process, fee established, proceeds deposited in Dale Co. Sheriff's Service of Process Fee Fund
Title
Dale Co., sheriff, service of process, fee established, proceeds deposited in Dale Co. Sheriff's Service of Process Fee Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 58 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 58 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:24 p.m. on March 1, 2016. |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-53. |
2016-03-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 248 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-02-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 12 |
2016-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |