AL HB178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:14 p.m. on May 9, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:14 p.m. on May 9, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2017, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities contingent upon adoption of const. amend. proposed by SB147, 2012 Reg. Sess.
Title
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2017, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities contingent upon adoption of const. amend. proposed by SB147, 2012 Reg. Sess.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:14 p.m. on May 9, 2017. |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-299. |
2017-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 271 |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | Rereferred from Ways and Means Education to Ways and Means General Fund |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |