AL HB176 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor on March 15, 2018 at 1:46 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor on March 15, 2018 at 1:46 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lyman Ward Military Academy, appropriation
Title
Lyman Ward Military Academy, appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 15, 2018 at 1:46 p.m. on March 15, 2018. |
2018-03-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-282. |
2018-03-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 834 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2018-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 307 |
2018-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |