AL HB174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Absentee voting, allow permanently disabled voters to automatically receive absentee ballots before elections
Title
Absentee voting, allow permanently disabled voters to automatically receive absentee ballots before elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Bracy motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-359. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Bracy motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1103 |
2019-05-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1150 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1149 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reed Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Figures motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 394 |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |