AL HB174 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 3:23 p.m. on February 25, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Employment, Alabama Uniform Minimum Wage and Right to Work Act, prohibit local governmental entities from requiring minimum wage or other benefits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment, Alabama Uniform Minimum Wage and Right to Work Act, prohibit local governmental entities from requiring minimum wage or other benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 71 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Henry motion to Previous Question (Y: 71 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Faulkner motion to Table (Y: 71 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:23 p.m. on February 25, 2016.
2016-02-25HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-18 on 02/25/2016.
2016-02-25HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-02-25SenateSignature Requested
2016-02-25HouseEnrolled
2016-02-25HousePassed Second House
2016-02-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 208
2016-02-25SenateRules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 207
2016-02-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-02-24SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2016-02-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 25
2016-02-16HouseHenry motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 24
2016-02-16HouseFaulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 23
2016-02-16HouseMelton Amendment Offered
2016-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB174
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB174-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB174-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=534541&VOTE=23&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=534542&VOTE=24&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=534544&VOTE=25&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=537338&VOTE=207&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=537339&VOTE=208&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback